IL SB2962 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-25 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Wildlife Code. Deletes language providing that the season limit for river otter shall not exceed 5 river otters per person per season. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

WILDLIFE-RIVER OTTER LIMIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-04-23HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-001-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Agriculture; 008-001-000
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Agriculture
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52052.30Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback