IL SB2958 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Tax Lien Registration Act. Provides that the notice of tax lien shall also include the county or counties where the real property of the debtor to which the lien will attach is located. Provides that a tax lien that is filed in the registry shall be attached to all of the existing and after-acquired real and personal property of the debtor. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TAX LIEN-REAL PROPERTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-19HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Revenue; 005-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
357501-15Amended CodeCitation Text
357501-20Amended CodeCitation Text
357501-25Amended CodeCitation Text
357501-30Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback