IL SB2957 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0767
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Act on the Aging. In provisions concerning the Long Term Care Ombudsman Program, expands the definition of "access" to means the right to inspect and copy the clinical and other records of a participant or resident, regardless of age, with the express written consent of the participant or resident, or if consent is given orally, visually, or through the use of auxiliary aids and services, such consent is documented contemporaneously by a representative of the Office of State Long Term Care Ombudsman. In provisions requiring long term care facilities, supportive living facilities, assisted living establishments, and shared housing establishments to permit Office representatives to examine and copy a resident's clinical and other reports, includes facility reports of incidents or occurrences involving the resident that were made to other State agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AGING-LONG TERM OMBUDSMAN

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-08-02SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0767
2024-08-02SenateEffective Date January 1, 2025
2024-08-02SenateGovernor Approved
2024-06-14SenateSent to the Governor
2024-05-16SenatePassed Both Houses
2024-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2024-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet
2024-05-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2024-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly
2024-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2024-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
2024-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness
2024-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Yolonda Morris
2024-05-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2024-05-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
2024-04-15HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2024-04-11HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-04-11HouseFirst Reading
2024-04-11HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2024-04-10HouseArrived in House
2024-04-10SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2024-04-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2024
2024-04-09SenateSecond Reading
2024-03-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 22, 2024
2024-03-21SenateDo Pass as Amended Health and Human Services; 009-000-000
2024-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2024-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Health and Human Services
2024-03-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
2024-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2024-03-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter
2024-02-21SenatePostponed - Health and Human Services
2024-02-06SenateAssigned to Health and Human Services
2024-01-31SenateReferred to Assignments
2024-01-31SenateFirst Reading
2024-01-31SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
201054.04Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback