IL SB2957 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that any qualified not-for-profit agency for persons with significant disabilities entering into a contract with the State for supplies and services under specified provisions shall offer a minimum hourly wage to its employees that is set at or above the State minimum wage.
Title
PROCUREMENT-MINIMUM WAGE
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Sen. Robert Peters [D] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] |
Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] | Sen. Patrick Joyce [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Postponed - Labor |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 45-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2957&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB2957.htm |