IL SB2954 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0624
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Universities Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that if an employer fails to transmit required contributions to the System for more than 120 days after the payment of those contributions is due, the Board may certify to the State Comptroller the amount of those delinquent employer contributions and the State Comptroller shall deduct the certified amount from State funds to the employer and remit the amount deducted to the System. Provides that if State funds from which those deductions may be made are not available or if deductions are delayed for longer than 120 days after the date of the certification to the Comptroller, the Board may proceed against the employer to recover the amounts of such delinquent payments in the appropriate circuit court. Adds similar provisions if the employer is a community college district. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-SURS-EMPLOYER CONTRIB

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-20SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0624
2018-07-20SenateEffective Date July 20, 2018
2018-07-20SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-14SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 014-000-000
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Aquino
2018-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40515-155.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2954&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2954.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2954eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2954enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0624.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2954sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2954ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2954_05022018_029000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2954_05252018_031000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2954ham001_05302018_036000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback