IL SB2954 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1107
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probate Act of 1975. Provides that a guardian of an adult disabled ward's person and estate has the authority to commence proceedings, including, but not limited to, adoption, marriage, or dissolution of marriage proceedings, on behalf of the ward if the court finds the proceedings to be in the best interests of the ward.
Title
ADULT GUARDIANSHIP-DISSOLUTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1107 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Effective Date August 26, 2014 |
2014-08-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-22 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2014-05-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 |
2014-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-05-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 015-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2014-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-05-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-05-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-07 | House | First Reading |
2014-04-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-04-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
755 | 5 | 11a-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |