IL SB2953 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Automotive Repair Act. Requires an automotive repair facility to post charges for labor, storage, parts, and diagnosis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AUTO REPAIR ACT-POST CHARGES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-24SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000
2018-04-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-17SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
81530617New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback