IL SB2952 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0995
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0995
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Further amends the Illinois Pension Code. In a provision of the Chicago Firefighter Article concerning the membership of the board of trustees, provides that the city treasurer, with the prior approval of the board, may appoint a designee from among employees of the city who is versed in the affairs of the city treasurer's office to act in the absence of the city treasurer on all matters pertaining to administering the Article.
Title
PEN CD-CHI LABORERS-BOARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0995 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 17, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Van Pelt |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 8, 2022 |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Do Pass Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 11-181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |