IL SB2952 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-08 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Provides that the Department of Human Services, in consultation with the Advisory Committee, shall adopt rules allowing licensed prescribers or pharmacists who have registered to access the Prescription Monitoring Program to authorize a licensed or non-licensed designee (rather than any designee) employed in that licensed prescriber's office or licensed pharmacist's pharmacy and who has received training in the federal Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act to consult the Prescription Monitoring Program on their behalf. Requires the Clinical Director of the Prescription Monitoring Program to select 6 members (rather than 5 members), 3 physicians, 2 pharmacists, and one dentist, of the Prescription Monitoring Program Advisory Committee to serve as members of the peer review subcommittee. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONTROL SUB-PMP&ADV COMMITTEE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Public Health
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-28SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 29, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Bush
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Bush
2018-05-03SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 006-000-000
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Bush
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-04-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-20SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass Public Health; 009-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720570316Amended CodeCitation Text
720570320Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2952&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2952.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2952eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2952enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2952sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2952sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2952sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2952sam004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2952ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2952ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2952_05032018_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2952_05252018_030000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2952ham002_05312018_028000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback