IL SB2951 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Early Mental Health and Addictions Treatment Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, and other specified agencies and entities, to develop a pilot program under which a qualifying adolescent or young adult may receive community-based mental health treatment from a youth-focused community support team for early treatment that is specifically tailored to the needs of youth and young adults in the early stages of a serious emotional disturbance or serious mental illness. Requires the Department to apply, no later than September 30, 2019, for any necessary federal waiver or State Plan amendment to implement the pilot program. Requires the Department to implement the pilot program no later than December 31, 2019 if federal approval is not necessary. Contains provisions concerning the creation of a community-based treatment model under the pilot program; the development of a pay-for-performance payment model; Department rules to implement the pilot program; and analytics and outcomes report. Requires the Department to develop an Assertive Engagement and Community-Based Clinical Treatment Pilot Program for individuals with opioid and other drug addictions. Contains provisions on in-office, in-home, and in-community services provided under the pilot program; application for a federal waiver or State Plan amendment to implement the pilot program; development of a pay-for-performance payment model; Department rules to implement the pilot program; and analytics and outcomes report. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EARLY MENTAL HEALTH ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback