IL SB2951 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1007
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1007
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that a person commits crowding or threatening a bicyclist when a person driving a motor vehicle recklessly drives the motor vehicle unnecessarily close to, toward, or near a bicyclist. Provides that every person convicted of crowding or threatening a bicyclist shall be guilty of a Class A misdemeanor if the violation does not result in great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to another. Provides that if a crowding or threatening a bicyclist violation results in great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to another, the person shall be guilty of a Class 4 felony. Provides that a person commits projecting or throwing missiles at bicyclists, a Class A misdemeanor, when a person projects or throws any missile (defined as any object or substance) at or against a bicyclist. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-BICYCLIST SAFETY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 93 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1007 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-07-06 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons | |
2010-04-21 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-020-001 | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2010-04-21 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-20 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass / Short Debate Vehicles & Safety Committee; 004-002-000 | |
2010-04-13 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. | |
2010-04-08 | Assigned to Vehicles & Safety Committee | |
2010-03-26 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading | |
2010-03-26 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell | |
2010-03-26 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2010-03-26 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2010-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-26 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente | |
2010-03-18 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-002 | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Silverstein | |
2010-03-18 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 007-000-000 | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2010-03-16 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2010-03-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-12 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2010-03-09 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 10, 2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 25, 2010 | |
2010-02-24 | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 008-000-001 | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled in Criminal Law; Silverstein | |
2010-02-24 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-02-23 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-18 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2010-02-17 | Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2010-02-17 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2010-02-16 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading | |
2010-01-28 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |