IL SB2943 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Grants the Community and Residential Services Authority the authority to provide to youth in this State who are eligible for placement in a residential facility, but who have not been placed in a facility with the opportunity to be placed in a residential facility through the use of an individual agreement. Sets forth the duties of the Community and Residential Services Authority in regard to the placement of youth under an individual agreement in residential placement facilities, including prioritizing residential programs that have been approved by State agencies and preparing the individual agreement contract to be used by State agencies. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-CRSA-RESIDENTIAL AGMNT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Postponed - Behavioral and Mental Health |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Behavioral and Mental Health |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Behavioral and Mental Health |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Postponed - Behavioral and Mental Health |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Directed to Multiple Committees Behavioral and Mental Health, Appropriations-Education Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Directed to Multiple Committees Behavioral and Mental Health, Appropriations-Education Subcommittee |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 14-15.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |