IL SB2941 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0599
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Postsecondary and Workforce Readiness Act. With respect to the State Board of Education's competency-based, high school graduation requirements pilot program, provides that a school district may participate in the program for some or all of its schools (instead of for some or all of its schools serving grades 9 through 12). Allows school districts to collaboratively apply to participate in the pilot program; sets forth provisions governing a collaborative of districts.
Title
HIGH SCH GRAD REQUIREMENT PROG
Sponsors
Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0599 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Effective Date June 29, 2018 |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-18 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000 |
2018-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McGuire |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 148 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 148 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |