IL SB2941 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Postsecondary and Workforce Readiness Act. With respect to the State Board of Education's competency-based, high school graduation requirements pilot program, provides that a school district may participate in the program for some or all of its schools (instead of for some or all of its schools serving grades 9 through 12). Allows school districts to collaboratively apply to participate in the pilot program; sets forth provisions governing a collaborative of districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGH SCH GRAD REQUIREMENT PROG

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Education; 008-000-000
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Education
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2018-05-14HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 046-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McGuire
2018-04-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 011-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-13SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass Education; 008-000-000
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-02-26SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11014820Amended CodeCitation Text
11014825Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback