IL SB2940 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0839
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Township Code. Provides that the electors may delegate the power to purchase, sell, or lease property to the township board for a period of up to 12 months and the township board may specify properties being considered. Makes a conforming change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TWP BOARD-PURCHASING PROPERTY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-13SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0839
2018-08-13SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-13SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-006-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Counties & Townships Committee
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Local Government; 008-000-000
2018-02-28SenatePostponed - Local Government
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Local Government
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60130-50Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback