IL SB2939 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Mathematics and Science Academy Law. Provides that tuition, fees, and room and board costs shall be charged for students of the Illinois Mathematics and Science Academy who are not Illinois residents. Provides that the Academy may admit students (i) who are Illinois residents or who are not Illinois residents (rather than students) and (ii) who have completed the academic equivalent of the 8th (rather than 9th) grade. Makes related changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MATH&SCIENCE ACADEMY-TUITION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes
2018-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-10SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass Education; 012-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Education
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1053052Amended CodeCitation Text
1053054Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback