IL SB2927 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-11)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Higher Education Veterans Service Act. Provides that each public college or university that is required to have a Coordinator of Veterans and Military Personnel Student Services shall report to the Board of Higher Education information on the its efforts in attracting, recruiting, and retaining veterans and military personnel at the institution. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIGHER ED-VETERAN ACT-REPORT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-21SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1015
2018-08-21SenateEffective Date August 21, 2018
2018-08-21SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-29SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government
2018-05-31SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3 - May 30, 2018
2018-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2, 3
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-006-000
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000
2018-05-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-28HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 018-000-000
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Higher Education Committee
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-04-23HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-000-000
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Higher Education
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1104920Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2927&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2927.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2927eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2927enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-1015.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2927ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2927ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2927ham003.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2927_04232018_011000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2927_05302018_014000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2927ham003_05312018_054001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2927ham002_05312018_054000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback