IL SB2926 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Landscape Architecture Act of 1989. Changes the title of the Act to the Illinois Landscape Architecture Practice Act (and makes conforming changes in various other Acts). Allows an unlicensed person who has completed the educational requirements, is actively participating in the diversified professional training, and maintains a training record with good standing to use the title "landscape architectural associate", but prohibits that person from independently engaging in the practice of landscape architecture. Requires an applicant for licensure as a landscape architect to pass an examination that includes the Landscape Architect Registration Examination and makes other changes in provisions concerning qualifications for licensure. Adds provisions concerning public policy, exemptions, application of the Act, and technical submissions. Makes changes in provisions concerning definitions, use of titles without a license, continuing education, and civil and criminal penalties for violation of the Act. Makes other changes.
Title
LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTURE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 315 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 315 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 315 | 12.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 315 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 315 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 315 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 315 | 18.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 315 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 315 | 2.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 315 | 2.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 315 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 315 | 3.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 315 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 315 | 5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
225 | 315 | 6.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 745 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 1205 | 8-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 1505 | 26.10-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2926&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2926.htm |