IL SB2925 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board shall develop or approve a curriculum for a certified training program for school resource officers which shall consist of at least 40 hours of training. Provides that the curriculum shall include the following subject areas: (1) child and adolescent development and psychology; (2) positive behavioral interventions and support, conflict resolution techniques, and restorative justice techniques; (3) education law; (4) juvenile law; (5) implicit bias; (6) trauma-informed care; (7) de-escalation techniques, including techniques for limiting the use of physical force and mechanical and chemical restraints; (8) the mental, physical, and behavioral health needs of all children and adolescents including those with disabilities or special needs; (9) a minimum of 8 hours of crisis intervention training for youth; and (10) cultural responsiveness. Provides that the Board by rule shall require a law enforcement officer to successfully complete the certified training program for school resource officers before or within 120 days of a law enforcement officer's first day of service in a school. Provides that the certified training program for school resource officers shall be successfully completed by school resource officers every 4 years. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENFORCEMENT TRAINING-SCHOOL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-04-17SenateDo Pass as Amended Education; 011-001-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Education
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Education
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-27SenateRe-referred to Education
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5070510.22New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback