IL SB2920 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2020, all counties with less than 3,000,000 inhabitants shall use a uniform property index number based on a format prescribed by the Department of Revenue. Makes changes concerning qualifications for township or multi-township assessors and supervisors of assessments. Provides that certain notices shall be posted on the Department of Revenue's official website. Provides that the effective date of a certificate for designation as a pollution control facility shall be the date of recommendation by the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency to the Illinois Pollution Control Board. Provides that physical or paper transfer tax stamps shall be phased out and eliminated by December 31, 2021. Amends the State Tax Lien Registration Act and the Senior Citizens Real Estate Tax Deferral Act to provide that certain taxes deferred under the Senior Citizens Real Estate Tax Deferral program shall be included in the registry. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-04-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
320304Amended CodeCitation Text
352001-120Amended CodeCitation Text
3520011-25Amended CodeCitation Text
3520017-20Amended CodeCitation Text
3520017-40Amended CodeCitation Text
352002-45Amended CodeCitation Text
352003-5Amended CodeCitation Text
3520031-15Amended CodeCitation Text
3520031-5Amended CodeCitation Text
352008-35Amended CodeCitation Text
357501-10Amended CodeCitation Text
357501-15Amended CodeCitation Text
357501-30Amended CodeCitation Text
357501-5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback