IL SB2919 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Corporate Accountability for Tax Expenditures Act. Repeals a Section requiring the Department of Revenue to submit an annual Unified Economic Development Budget to the General Assembly. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDOR-ECON DEVELOPMENT BUDGET

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000
2018-04-11SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2071510Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback