IL SB2918 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on October 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Fund the Police Act. Creates the Fund the Police Grant Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that from appropriations to the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board from the Fund, the Board must make grants to units of local government and Illinois public universities for the purpose of: (1) hiring law enforcement officers; (2) providing mental health care for law enforcement officers; (3) providing for hiring, retention incentives, and overtime payments for law enforcement officers; (4) purchasing public safety equipment designed to prevent gang violence, motor vehicle theft, vehicular hijacking, or the sale of contraband; and (5) training for law enforcement officers in preventing gang violence, motor vehicle theft, vehicular hijacking, or the sale of contraband. Provides that moneys in the Fund the Police Grant Fund may not be appropriated, assigned, or transferred to another State fund. Provides that, as soon as practical after the effective date of the Act, the State Comptroller shall direct and the State Treasurer shall transfer the sum of $100,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Fund the Police Grant Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to make conforming changes.
Title
FUND THE POLICE ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Jason Plummer [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. Donald DeWitte [R] |
Sen. Terri Bryant [R] | Sen. Win Stoller [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-10-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-10-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2918&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2918.htm |