IL SB2918 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that except for a municipality with 1,000,000 or more inhabitants, a unit of local government may not impose a fee for a permit in excess of the fees provided for in specified provisions of the Code. Limits home rule powers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IDOT-PAY FOR PERFORMANCE PGM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 011-000-000
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-04-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625515-315.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback