IL SB2917 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-11-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Epinephrine Auto-Injector Act. Provides that when an employee or agent of an authorized entity or other individual who has completed specified anaphylaxis training administers an epinephrine auto-injector in good faith, the authorized agency, and its employees and agents, including a physician, physician's assistant with prescriptive authority, or advanced practice registered nurse with prescriptive authority who provides a standing order or prescription for an epinephrine auto-injector, incur no civil or professional liability, except for willful and wanton conduct, as a result of any injury or death arising from the use of an epinephrine auto-injector. Provides that a health care professional shall not be subject to civil or professional liability for not providing an epinephrine auto-injector standing order or prescription.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPINEPHRINE AUTO-INJECTOR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-15SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4102710Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback