IL SB2915 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that the minor who is the subject of record, his or her parents, guardian, and counsel shall have the right to inspect and copy law enforcement records maintained by a law enforcement agency or record of municipal ordinance violations maintained by any State, local, or municipal agency that relate to a minor who has been investigated, arrested, or taken into custody before his or her 18th birthday. Provides that public defenders shall have access to these law enforcement and juvenile court records under specified circumstances. Makes changes to the juvenile court and law enforcement juvenile records expungement procedures. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV CT-EXPUNGE-CONFIDENTIAL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 81 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 081-029-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-08HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-01HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Mulroe
2018-04-23SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 011-000-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2018-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054051-7Amended CodeCitation Text
7054051-8Amended CodeCitation Text
7054055-915Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback