IL SB2915 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Requires the Inspector General for the Department of Human Services to report to the Department of Public Health's health care worker registry the identity and finding of each employee of a facility or agency against whom there is a final investigative report containing a substantiated allegation of physical or sexual abuse, financial exploitation, or egregious neglect of an individual (rather than physical or sexual abuse or egregious neglect of an individual). Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-HLTH CARE WORKER REGISTRY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1163 |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-04 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Revenue; 010-000-000 |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Revenue |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-02 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-12-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - December 2, 2014 |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2014-11-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2014-11-20 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-11-20 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John E. Bradley |
2014-11-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-11-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2014-11-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2014-11-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |
2014-11-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-11-18 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-05-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-05-28 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2014-05-28 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2014-05-28 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2014-05-28 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2014-05-28 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2014-05-28 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2014-05-28 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2014-05-28 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2014-05-28 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2014-05-28 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2014-05-27 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2014-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2014-05-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 30, 2014 |
2014-05-16 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2014 |
2014-04-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-04 | House | First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2014-03-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 25, 2014 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 20, 2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 1-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |