IL SB2914 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Retail Electric Competition Act of 2006 of the Public Utilities Act. Provides that any information in the report submitted by the Office of Retail Market Development on June 30 of each year involving price comparison between electric utilities, electric utilities providing service outside their service territories, or alternative retail electric suppliers shall also include the combined value of certain additional products and services offered by the competitive retail electricity market. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission may include other energy savings and marketing savings programs as they develop in the market.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UTILITY-RETAIL MARKET DEVELOP

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 009-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Energy and Public Utilities
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
220520-110Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback