IL SB2914 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retail Electric Competition Act of 2006 of the Public Utilities Act. Provides that any information in the report submitted by the Office of Retail Market Development on June 30 of each year involving price comparison between electric utilities, electric utilities providing service outside their service territories, or alternative retail electric suppliers shall also include the combined value of certain additional products and services offered by the competitive retail electricity market. Provides that the Illinois Commerce Commission may include other energy savings and marketing savings programs as they develop in the market.
Title
UTILITY-RETAIL MARKET DEVELOP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | To Regulatory Matters Subcommittee |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass Energy and Public Utilities; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 20-110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |