IL SB2913 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-16 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires long-term care providers to submit all changes in resident status, including, but not limited to, death, discharge, changes in patient credit, third party liability, and Medicare coverage to the Department of Healthcare and Family Services through the Medical Electronic Data Interchange System, the Recipient Eligibility Verification System, or the Electronic Data Interchange System under a specified schedule. Requires the Department and other agencies to establish an expedited long-term care eligibility determination and enrollment system. Requires the Director of Healthcare and Family Services, in coordination with the Secretary of Human Services and the Director of Aging, to hold meetings for provider associations representing facilities licensed under the Nursing Home Care Act and certified as supportive living programs. Provides that the meetings shall be held every 6 weeks until all backlogged cases have been adjudicated and the application process has been reduced to the federal timeframe. Contains provisions concerning a 45-day extension of the federal eligibility application processing deadline in suspected cases of fraud; the identification of applicants who had full Medicaid benefits in the community for 6 months or more immediately before entering the long-term care facility; reporting requirements; public-private partnerships aimed at redeploying caseworkers to targeted high-Medicaid facilities for the purpose of expediting initial Medicaid and long-term care benefits applications; the establishment of a Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act compliant database; and other matters. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-EXPEDITED LONG-TERM CARE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-000
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-03-09SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-03-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-03-08SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2018-02-15SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305511-5.4Amended CodeCitation Text
30555-5gNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback