IL SB2912 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that a superintendent of a department of public works shall be a registered professional engineer, hold a degree in engineering from an accredited institution of higher learning, or have at least 10 years of professional, management-level experience in either a municipal or county public works department (rather than the superintendent shall be a registered professional engineer). Effective immediately.
Title
SUPERINTENDENT OF PUBLIC WORKS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-04-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-03-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2022-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-02-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-010-000 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Johnson |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 006-001-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 17, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 005-001-000 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2021-09-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-09-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-09-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-15003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |