IL SB2907 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0718
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Identification Act. Provides agencies and entities in this State authorized by law to conduct or obtain national criminal history background checks for persons shall be eligible to participate in the Federal Rap Back Service administered by the Department of State Police. Provides the Department of State Police may submit fingerprints to the Federal Bureau of Investigation Rap Back Service to be retained in the Federal Bureau of Investigation Rap Back Service for the purpose of being searched by future submissions to the Federal Bureau of Investigation Rap Back Service, including latent fingerprint searches and to collect all Federal Rap Back Service fees from eligible agencies and entities wishing to participate in the Rap Back Service and remit those fees to the Federal Bureau of Investigation. Allows the Department of State Police to adopt any rules necessary for implementation of this provision. Defines "national criminal history record check" and "Rap Back Service".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE POLICE-RAP BACK SERVICE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-03SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0718
2018-08-03SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-03SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-05-25HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-002-001
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-22HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-05-14HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-10HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-09HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-05-09HouseArrived in House
2018-05-09SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2018-03-14SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-03-14SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2018-03-08SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026303.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback