IL SB2905 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0884
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0884
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides that the Illinois Community College Board may, in collaboration with community colleges, furnish information for State and federal accountability purposes, promote student and institutional improvement, and meet research needs. Provides that the Board may review and approve or disapprove (rather than participate in and recommend approval or disapproval of) any contract or agreement that community colleges enter into with any organization, association, educational institution, or government agency to provide educational services and may monitor the performance under any contract. Requires the board of trustees of each community college district to file a written or electronic copy of its annual budget with the Board. Provides that any graduate from a recognized high school or student otherwise qualified to attend a public community college and residing outside a community college district may attend any recognized public community college in this State at the tuition rate of a student residing in the district; requires the Board to pay the community college the difference between the in-district and out-of-district tuition amounts. Provides that, for tuition purposes, a student shall be classified as a resident of a community college district after establishing the 30-day residency requirement of the district. Repeals provisions governing indemnification, deferred maintenance grants, the College and Career Readiness Pilot Program, a directory of graduating vocational and technical school students, and other items. Makes other changes. Amends the State Finance Act to make a conforming change.
Title
COMMUNITY COLLEGE ACT-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Rep. Chad Hays [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0884 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 054-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Higher Education |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 015-000-000 |
2018-05-14 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Postponed - Higher Education |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |