IL SB2904 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0605
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on July 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0605
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Physician Assistant Practice Act of 1987. Removes language providing that a collaborating physician may collaborate with a maximum of 5 full-time equivalent physician assistants. Amends the Medical Practice Act of 1987, removes language providing that a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches may enter into collaborative agreements with no more than 5 full-time equivalent physician assistants except in a hospital, hospital affiliate, or ambulatory surgical treatment center.
Title
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0605 |
2018-07-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-07-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 007-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-001-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-10 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-004-002 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 60 | 54.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 95 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |