IL SB2903 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act. Requires the Secretary of State to issue standard Illinois Identification Cards and limited-term Illinois Identification Cards to persons upon conditional release or absolute discharge from the custody of the Department of Human Services with specified requirements. Provides the fee requirement for issuance of standard Illinois Identification Cards and limited-term Illinois Identification Cards. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-RELEASED PERSON ID CARD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-19HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-19HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-18HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 006-000-000
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Human Services
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Karen McConnaughay

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1533512Amended CodeCitation Text
153354Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback