IL SB2901 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Revised Uniform Unclaimed Property Act. Provides that certain property is presumed abandoned after 5 (instead of 3) years. Provides that any property due or owed by a business association to or for the benefit of another business association resulting from a transaction occurring in the normal and ordinary course of business is exempt from the Act. Provides that an action or proceeding may not be maintained by the State Treasurer ("administrator") to enforce the Act in regard to the reporting, delivery, or payment of property more than 5 years after the holder filed a non-fraudulent report with the administrator (instead of 10 after the holder specifically identified the property in a report filed with the administrator or gave express notice to the administrator of a dispute regarding the property). Deletes language providing that in the absence of a report or other express notice, the period of limitation is tolled, and that the period of limitation is also tolled by the filing of a report that is fraudulent. Provides instead that the parties may agree to extend the limitation period. Provides that the administrator may not commence an action, proceeding, or examination with respect to a duty of a holder under the Act more than 10 years after the duty arose. Provides that in the absence of certain records the administrator may use specified estimation techniques. Provides that within 60 business days of the receipt of a final examination report, a holder may request a hearing to contest the use or validity of estimation techniques. Deletes provisions concerning the administrator's authority to contract with another to conduct an examination. Provides instead that the administrator may not enter into a contract with a person to conduct an examination of a holder under which the administrator agrees to pay the person a fee based upon a percentage of the property recovered for this State. Deletes language providing that an initial report filed under the Act for property that was not required to be reported before the effective date of the Act, but that is required to be reported under the Act, must include all items of property that would have been presumed abandoned during the 5-year period preceding the effective date of the Act as if the Act had been in effect during that period. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

UNCLAIMED PROPERTY-VARIOUS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-04-27SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-13SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018
2018-04-11SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
765102615-1006Amended CodeCitation Text
765102615-1009Amended CodeCitation Text
765102615-1503Amended CodeCitation Text
765102615-201Amended CodeCitation Text
765102615-610Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback