IL SB2900 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0800
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With regard to the election of school board members of a community unit school district (formed before January 1, 1975) or combined school district (formed before July 1, 1983), provides that if a school board fills a vacancy due to a lack of candidates for election in a congressional township in the most recent election, then the school board shall, by resolution, order submitted to the school district's voters at the next general election a proposition for the election of a board member at large without restriction by area of residence within the district (rather than in accordance with mandatory board representation) and the proposition shall be certified by the school board's secretary for submission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SCH BOARD VACANCY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-10SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0800
2018-08-10SenateEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-10SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-22SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-25SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-002-000
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-21HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick
2018-04-18HouseArrived in House
2018-04-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2018
2018-02-28SenateDo Pass Government Reform; 008-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Government Reform
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-10.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback