IL SB2900 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0800
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0800
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to the election of school board members of a community unit school district (formed before January 1, 1975) or combined school district (formed before July 1, 1983), provides that if a school board fills a vacancy due to a lack of candidates for election in a congressional township in the most recent election, then the school board shall, by resolution, order submitted to the school district's voters at the next general election a proposition for the election of a board member at large without restriction by area of residence within the district (rather than in accordance with mandatory board representation) and the proposition shall be certified by the school board's secretary for submission.
Title
SCH CD-SCH BOARD VACANCY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0800 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-002-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-07 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 1, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Do Pass Government Reform; 008-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Government Reform |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-10.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |