IL SB2899 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0936
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0936
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Promotion Act. Provides that moneys that are required to be deposited into the Tourism Promotion Fund from the proceeds of the tax imposed under the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act shall be deposited directly into the Tourism Promotion Fund. Provides that, if the available proceeds from the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act after certain other deposits have been made is less than the amount required to be deposited into the Tourism Promotion Fund, then the amount of the deficiency shall be transferred from the General Revenue Fund to the Tourism Promotion Fund in the next calendar month. Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes changes concerning grants from the Local Tourism Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-TOURISM PROMOTION
Sponsors
Sen. William Haine [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Sen. Steven Landek [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0936 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date August 17, 2018 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-001 |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 016-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment |
2018-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-16 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-05-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Bennett |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 605 | 46.6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 605 | 605-705 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 665 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 145 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |