IL SB2899 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0936
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Promotion Act. Provides that moneys that are required to be deposited into the Tourism Promotion Fund from the proceeds of the tax imposed under the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act shall be deposited directly into the Tourism Promotion Fund. Provides that, if the available proceeds from the Hotel Operators' Occupation Tax Act after certain other deposits have been made is less than the amount required to be deposited into the Tourism Promotion Fund, then the amount of the deficiency shall be transferred from the General Revenue Fund to the Tourism Promotion Fund in the next calendar month. Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Makes changes concerning grants from the Local Tourism Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCE-TOURISM PROMOTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0936
2018-08-17SenateEffective Date August 17, 2018
2018-08-17SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-30SenateSenate Concurs
2018-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000
2018-05-29SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 008-000-000
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2018-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-28SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-001
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 016-000-000
2018-05-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote
2018-05-18HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-16HouseAssigned to Environment
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-03HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-03HouseArrived in House
2018-05-02SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Bennett
2018-05-02SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-04-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-19SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-04-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass as Amended Commerce and Economic Development; 010-000-000
2018-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Commerce and Economic Development
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-01SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2060546.6aAmended CodeCitation Text
20605605-705Amended CodeCitation Text
206654aAmended CodeCitation Text
351456Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2899&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2899.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2899eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2899enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0936.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2899sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2899sam002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2899sam003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2899ham001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2899_05022018_003000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2899_05252018_019000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2899ham001_05302018_032000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback