IL SB2898 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that licensed medically complex for the developmentally disabled facilities (MC/DD) (rather than licensed long-term care facilities for persons under 22 years of age) that serve severely and chronically ill patients (rather than pediatric patients) shall have a specific reimbursement system designed to recognize the characteristics and needs of the patients they serve. Sets forth certain reimbursement rates for MC/DD facilities for date of services starting July 1, 2018. Requires MC/DD facilities to document within each resident's medical record the conditions or services using the minimum data set documentation standards and requirements to qualify for exceptional care reimbursement. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall be responsible for reimbursement calculations and direct payment for services. Imposes an assessment and licensing fee on MC/DD facilities. Creates the Medically Complex for the Developmentally Disabled Provider Fund for the purpose of receiving and disbursing assessment moneys, including making payments to intermediate care facilities for persons with a developmental disability that are also licensed as MC/DD facilities and making payments of any amounts which are reimbursable to the federal government. Makes other changes. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Medically Complex for the Developmentally Disabled Provider Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAID-MC/DD FACILITIES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy
2018-04-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-04-18SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-04-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-03-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-03-05SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2018
2018-02-27SenateDo Pass Human Services; 006-002-000
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301055.886New CodeSee Bill Text
30555-5.4hAmended CodeCitation Text
30555C-1Amended CodeCitation Text
30555C-11New CodeSee Bill Text
30555C-2Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback