IL SB2896 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Bicentennial Office and Commission Act. Creates the Office of the Illinois Bicentennial. Provides for the duties and functions of the Bicentennial Office. Dissolves the Bicentennial Office on December 31, 2018. Creates the Illinois Bicentennial Commission. Provides for the membership of the Commission. Provides that members of the Commission shall receive no compensation or reimbursement for serving as members. Provides that the chairperson or co-chairpersons of the Commission shall be designated by the Governor. Provides for the functions and meetings of the Commission. Dissolves the Commission on December 31, 2018. Provides for the revocation of a previous Executive Order creating the State Bicentennial Commission, along with transfer provisions. Provides a savings clause. Repeals the Act on January 1, 2020. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IL BICENTENNIAL OFFICE & COMM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-27HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-25HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2018-04-25HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 038-019-000
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-002-000
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-04-04SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-03-29SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-03-01SenatePostponed - State Government
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback