IL SB2889 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Epinephrine Administration Act. Provides that a health care practitioner may prescribe epinephrine pre-filled syringes in the name of an authorized entity where allergens capable of causing anaphylaxis may be present. Provides that an authorized entity may acquire and stock a supply of undesignated epinephrine pre-filled syringes provided the undesignated epinephrine pre-filled syringes are stored in a specified location. Requires each employee, agent, or other individual of the authorized entity to complete a specified training program before using a pre-filled syringe to administer epinephrine. Provides that a trained employee, agent, or other individual of the authorized entity may either provide or administer an epinephrine pre-filled syringe to a person whom the employee, agent, or other individual believes in good faith is experiencing anaphylaxis. Provides that training under the Act shall be valid for 2 years. Requires the Department of Public Health to approve training programs, to list the approved programs on the Department's website, and to include links to training providers' websites on the Department's website. Contains provisions concerning costs, limitations, and rulemaking. Defines terms. Amends the School Code. In provisions concerning epinephrine administration, provides that epinephrine may be administered with a pre-filled syringe. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EPINEPHRINE ADMINISTRATION ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
2018-05-07HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2018-04-26HouseArrived in House
2018-04-25SenateThird Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Rose
2018-04-25SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 007-000-000
2018-04-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-11SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2018
2018-03-14SenateDo Pass as Amended Public Health; 007-000-000
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-03-13SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
2018-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-03-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose
2018-02-27SenatePostponed - Public Health
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Public Health
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chapin Rose

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105522-30Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback