IL SB2888 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0831
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0831
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the use of force in defense of a person.
Title
CD CORR-SUPERVISION-SPEEDING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 11 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0831 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2013 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2012-06-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-16 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-011-013 |
2012-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott E. Penny |
2012-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Cunningham |
2012-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2012-04-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2012-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-04-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 007-000-000 |
2012-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles W. Krezwick |
2012-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2012-04-16 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2012-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2012-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-04-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2012-03-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-000-000 |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2012 |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2012 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012 |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2012-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
2012-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 7-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |