IL SB2885 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Banking Act. Provides that a State bank that has been in existence for 10 years or more and has less than $50,000,000 (rather than $20,000,000) in assets may have a minimum of 3 directors. Extends the exemptions from loan and investment limits described in specified provisions of this Act to any department, bureau, board, commission, or establishment of the United States, including any corporation wholly owned by the United States. Provides that the Secretary shall provide information relating to the prior fiscal year upon the request of the State Banking Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE BANK-BOARD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseAssigned to Financial Institutions Committee
2018-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-09HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-23HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 045-000-000
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018
2018-04-11SenateDo Pass Financial Institutions; 008-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Financial Institutions
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
205516Amended CodeCitation Text
205535Amended CodeCitation Text
205580.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback