IL SB2884 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0935
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0935
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that nothing in provisions concerning the election of employee and annuitant trustees shall preclude the Board of Trustees of the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund from adopting rules that provide for Internet balloting or phone balloting in addition to election by mail. Provides that an Internet or phone ballot cast in accordance with these rules shall be a valid ballot. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
PEN CD-IMRF-TRUSTEE ELECTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0935 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-17 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-04-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 7-175.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |