IL SB2884 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0935
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that nothing in provisions concerning the election of employee and annuitant trustees shall preclude the Board of Trustees of the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund from adopting rules that provide for Internet balloting or phone balloting in addition to election by mail. Provides that an Internet or phone ballot cast in accordance with these rules shall be a valid ballot. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-IMRF-TRUSTEE ELECTION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0935
2018-08-17SenateGovernor Approved
2018-06-19SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-21SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-000-000
2018-04-26HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-04-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-04-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-17HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-17HouseArrived in House
2018-04-17SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-04-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-12SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4057-175.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback