IL SB2884 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that a person appointed and serving as an inspector general under the authority of an Act other than the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act shall not investigate alleged violations of the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act or rules adopted under the authority of that Act, unless he or she also is appointed and serves as an Executive Inspector General under the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Limits the positions that may be held by an Executive Inspector General or employee of the Office of the Executive Inspector General during their terms of appointment or employment. Lengthens the period of time during which an Executive Inspector General may commence an investigation and during which a complaint may be filed with the Executive Ethics Commission. Requires certain reports and responses to be made publicly accessible. Requires the Commission to annually report certain information to the General Assembly and Governor. Amends the Secretary of State Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ETHICS-INSPECTORS GENERAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Held in State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 30, 2012 |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 305 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 20-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 20-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 20-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 20-52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 20-65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 20-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 20-87 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2884&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB2884.htm |