IL SB2881 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that female and male condoms, incontinence products, diapers, and baby wipes shall be taxed by the State at a rate of 1% (currently, 6.25%). Provides that the net revenue from the 1% tax collected from the sale of those products shall be deposited into the State and Local Sales Tax Reform Fund. Amends the Use Tax, Service Occupation Tax, and Service Occupation Use Tax Acts to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SALES TAX-REDUCED RATE-CONDOMS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-05-15HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-15HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-05-10HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-05-09HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-04-23HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-23HouseArrived in House
2018-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 040-002-001
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018
2018-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateDo Pass Revenue; 009-000-000
2018-04-11SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2018-03-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-03-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2018-02-28SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-02-27SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-02-26SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-02-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-02-21SenateAssigned to Revenue
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-02-14SenateFirst Reading
2018-02-14SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Omar Aquino

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
351053-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351053-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351059Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351109Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351159Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-10Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-5.5Amended CodeCitation Text
351203Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback