IL SB2880 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0630
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a court may order the testimony of a victim who is a child under 18, a person with a moderate, severe, or profound intellectual disability, or a person affected by a developmental disability by means of a closed circuit television in a proceeding for the prosecution of an offense of criminal sexual assault, predatory criminal sexual assault of a child, aggravated criminal sexual assault, criminal sexual abuse, aggravated criminal sexual abuse aggravated battery or aggravated domestic battery, the testimony is taken during the proceeding, and the judge determines that testimony by the child victim or victim with a moderate, severe, or profound intellectual disability or victim affected by a developmental disability in the courtroom will result in the child or person with a moderate, severe, or profound intellectual disability or person affected by a developmental disability suffering serious emotional distress such that the child or person with a moderate, severe, or profound intellectual disability or person affected by a developmental disability cannot reasonably communicate or that the child or person with a moderate, severe, or profound intellectual disability or person affected by a developmental disability will suffer severe emotional distress and is likely to cause the child or person with a moderate, severe, or profound intellectual disability or person affected by a developmental disability to suffer severe adverse effects.
Title
CRIM PRO-VICTIM TESTIMONY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-22 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0630 |
2016-07-22 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-07-22 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2016-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-04-18 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-07 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-07 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-04-07 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 17, 2016 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 012-000-000 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 106B-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |