IL SB2878 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Personnel Code to provide for partial jurisdiction B exemption for certain positions within the Department of Human Services.
Title
PERSONNEL-JURISDICTION EXEMPT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 27, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 415 | 4d | Amended Code | Citation Text |